TX SB680 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to step therapy protocols required by a health benefit plan in connection with prescription drug coverage.
Title
Relating to step therapy protocols required by a health benefit plan in connection with prescription drug coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1102 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1102 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-16 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read |
2017-05-16 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |