TX SB68 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to strategic fiscal reviews of state agencies and programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to strategic fiscal reviews of state agencies and programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1472 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1472
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-16HouseAmended 1-Larson, Rodriguez, Flynn, K. Bell, Anchia, Nevárez, Bailes, J. Turner, Kuempel, Kacal, Toth, More
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3119 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback