TX SB679 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the administration of certain housing funds by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the administration of certain housing funds by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-27 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-24 | Amended | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-21 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Finance | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-04 | Filed | |
2009-02-04 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2296 (Same As) 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HOUSING TRUST FUND
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
LOANS
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
HOUSING TRUST FUND
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
LOANS