TX SB677 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a task force to identify opportunities for academic credit and industry recognition for inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a task force to identify opportunities for academic credit and industry recognition for inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-04HouseReferred to Corrections
2017-05-04HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateAmended
2017-04-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-15SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-15SenateRead first time
2017-01-31SenateFiled
2017-01-31SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback