TX SB671 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements for a language other than English.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the public high school graduation credit requirements for a language other than English.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1049 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22 Effective immediately
2017-05-22 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-11 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-11HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-09HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-09HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-02HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-11SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-05SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-05SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-05SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-30SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15SenateReferred to Education
2017-02-15SenateRead first time
2017-01-30SenateFiled
2017-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback