TX SB667 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing a guardianship compliance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing a guardianship compliance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1306 (Y: 129 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-28SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-28SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-15SenateRead first time
2017-01-30SenateFiled
2017-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback