TX SB654 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the participation of an advanced practice registered nurse as a primary care or network provider for certain governmental and other health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to the participation of an advanced practice registered nurse as a primary care or network provider for certain governmental and other health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Rep. John Smithee [R] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] |
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1538 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1496 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1496 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Passed (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | House | Passed |
2017-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health Care Providers
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
REGISTERED NURSES
HEALTH MAINTENANCE ORGANIZATIONS
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
REGISTERED NURSES