TX SB653 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of certain employees or annuitants convicted of certain felony offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of certain employees or annuitants convicted of certain felony offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-03SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-14SenateReferred to Education
2017-02-14SenateRead first time
2017-01-27SenateFiled
2017-01-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback