TX SB647 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and operation of the office of public insurance counsel.
Title
Relating to the continuation and operation of the office of public insurance counsel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-27 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-27 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-20 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-20 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-19 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-19 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2011-05-18 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-18 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-18 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-18 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-18 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2011-05-18 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2011-05-18 | Read | |
2011-05-18 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-12 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-12 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-12 | Record vote | |
2011-05-12 | Passed | |
2011-05-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-11 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-11 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-11 | Amended | |
2011-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-11 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-22 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-21 | Record vote | |
2011-03-21 | Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-21 | Record vote | |
2011-03-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-03-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-15 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed | |
2011-02-16 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |