TX SB628 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing actual progress for the purposes of determining the right to repurchase real property from a condemning entity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing actual progress for the purposes of determining the right to repurchase real property from a condemning entity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenatePassed
2017-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-10SenateRecord vote
2017-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-10SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-13SenateRead first time
2017-01-26SenateFiled
2017-01-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback