TX SB627 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Red River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Title
Relating to the Red River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Rep. Poncho Nevarez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#760 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#760 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Birdwell |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4632 (Same As) 2019-04-16 - Recommendations filed with the Speaker
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Governor
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RED RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Governor
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RED RIVER AUTHORITY OF TEXAS
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--River Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Sunset—Required Reviews