TX SB626 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Hidalgo County Healthcare District; decreasing the possible maximum rate of a tax.
Title
Relating to the Hidalgo County Healthcare District; decreasing the possible maximum rate of a tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
HIDALGO COUNTY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital