TX SB625 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibitions on the provision to certain children of procedures and treatments for gender transitioning, gender reassignment, or gender dysphoria and on the use of public money or public assistance to provide those procedures and treatments.
Title
Relating to prohibitions on the provision to certain children of procedures and treatments for gender transitioning, gender reassignment, or gender dysphoria and on the use of public money or public assistance to provide those procedures and treatments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1686 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Reported favorably as substituted
HB1686 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Reported favorably as substituted
SB14 (Same As) 2023-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/23
HB1686 (Same As) 2023-04-14 - Reported favorably as substituted
SB14 (Same As) 2023-06-02 - Effective on 9/1/23
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
MEDICAID
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
GENDER IDENTITY & EXPRESSION
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health Care Providers
Health--Children's Insurance
MEDICAID
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB625 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00625I.htm |