TX SB623 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-25 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disqualification of a district or county attorney who is the subject of a criminal investigation.
Title
Relating to the disqualification of a district or county attorney who is the subject of a criminal investigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2011-05-25 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-03 | Meeting cancelled | |
2011-05-03 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-19 | Withdrawn from schedule | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-31 | Record vote | |
2011-03-31 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-31 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-31 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Filed | |
2011-02-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Lawyers
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Lawyers