TX SB613 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to services provided by the Health and Human Services Commission to sexually violent offenders who are incompetent to attend sex offender treatment.
Title
Relating to services provided by the Health and Human Services Commission to sexually violent offenders who are incompetent to attend sex offender treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1469 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-05 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-05 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
SEXUAL OFFENDERS