TX SB604 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles and to the operations of certain other entities performing functions associated with the department.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles and to the operations of certain other entities performing functions associated with the department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1995 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FA3 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1995 (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FA3 Schwertner (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1995 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-20 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1508 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1507 |
2019-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment withdrawn 8-Fierro |
2019-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 6(g) |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 8-Fierro |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment withdrawn 7-Minjarez, et al. |
2019-05-17 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 7-Minjarez, Blanco, T. King, Raney, Ortega, Raymond, Kacal, Schaefer, Martinez Fischer, More |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 5-Canales |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment amended 6-Canales |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 5-Canales |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 3-Paddie |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment amended 4-Paddie |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 3-Paddie |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Paddie |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment amended 2-Paddie |
2019-05-17 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Paddie |
2019-05-17 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-16 | House | Postponed 5/17/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-16 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-14 | House | Postponed 5/16/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA3 Schwertner |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Nichols |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1541 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
AUTOMOBILE BURGLARY & THEFT PREVENTION AUTHORITY
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLE CRIME PREVENTION AUTHORITY
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSE PLATES
MOTOR VEHICLE CRIME PREVENTION AUTHORITY
MOTOR VEHICLE DEALERS
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration