TX SB6 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to regulations and policies for entering or using a bathroom or changing facility; authorizing a civil penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulations and policies for entering or using a bathroom or changing facility; authorizing a civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-15SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-15SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-15SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenatePassed
2017-03-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-15SenateRecord vote
2017-03-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-14SenateStatement(s) submitted
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmended
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmended
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateAmendment withdrawn
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmended
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2017-03-14SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-14SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-14SenateRecord vote
2017-03-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2017-01-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-17SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-11SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-05SenateFiled
2017-01-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB6
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00006I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00006S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00006E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=29
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-15-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=14
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=27
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=28
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-14-F.PDF#page=30

Bill Comments

feedback