TX SB598 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to auditable voting systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to auditable voting systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1532 (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1532
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Jetton
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Jetton
2021-05-25HouseVote reconsidered
2021-05-25HouseAmended 1-Jetton
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Elections
2021-04-15HouseRead first time
2021-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenatePassed
2021-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenateAmended
2021-04-12SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Hall
2021-04-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12SenateAmended
2021-04-12SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
2021-04-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-05SenateFiled
2021-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB598
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00598I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00598S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00598E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00598H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00598F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00598S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00598S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00598H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00598H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00598I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00598I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00598S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00598S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00598E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00598H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00598F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB598&RcdVtNo=1532&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments

feedback