TX SB589 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the licensing and regulation of behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts; requiring an occupational license; imposing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the licensing and regulation of behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts; requiring an occupational license; imposing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1613 (Y: 121 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1570 (Y: 107 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Passed (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 See remarks for effective date
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseNo action taken in committee
2017-05-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Public Health
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenatePassed
2017-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-01SenateRecord vote
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-01SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-05SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-02-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateFiled
2017-01-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB589
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00589I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00589S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00589E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00589H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00589F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-01-F.PDF#page=165
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB589&RcdVtNo=1570&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB589&RcdVtNo=1613&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=230

Bill Comments

feedback