TX SB586 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the distribution of universal service funds to certain small and rural incumbent local exchange companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution of universal service funds to certain small and rural incumbent local exchange companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1272 (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1263 (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-18HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-18SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-17SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-17SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-16HouseRecord vote
2017-05-16HousePassed
2017-05-16HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15HouseRecord vote
2017-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-05HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2017-05-05HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-01HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-01HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenatePassed
2017-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-20SenateRecord vote
2017-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-02-08SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-24SenateFiled
2017-01-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback