TX SB581 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex offender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirements for a change of name for a person with a final felony conviction or a person required to register as a sex offender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-11HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-09HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-01-24SenateFiled
2017-01-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback