TX SB578 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the Riverbend Water Resources District and the terms of the board of directors of that district.
Title
Relating to the composition of the Riverbend Water Resources District and the terms of the board of directors of that district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Subjects
RIVERBEND WATER RESOURCES DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB578 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00578I.htm |