TX SB578 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation by the Health and Human Services Commission of a veteran suicide prevention action plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation by the Health and Human Services Commission of a veteran suicide prevention action plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#2030 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1641 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-27HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-27SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-27SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-27SenateRead
2017-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-03-28HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-28SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenatePassed
2017-03-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-01-23SenateFiled
2017-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB578
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00578I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00578S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00578E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00578H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00578F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-28-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB578&RcdVtNo=1641&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB578&RcdVtNo=2030&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=76

Bill Comments

feedback