TX SB576 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a reporting requirement for certain incidents of sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking at certain public and private institutions of higher education; creating a criminal offense; authorizing administrative penalties.
Title
Relating to a reporting requirement for certain incidents of sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, or stalking at certain public and private institutions of higher education; creating a criminal offense; authorizing administrative penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Huffman [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STALKING
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Family
Family--Family Violence
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
STALKING