TX SB572 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to in-person visitation of religious counselors with certain health care facility patients and residents during a public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to in-person visitation of religious counselors with certain health care facility patients and residents during a public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1278 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-30HouseSenate discharges conferees-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateSenate discharges conferees
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1278
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-19HouseAmended 2-Slaton
2021-05-19HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-19HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Slaton
2021-05-19HouseAmended 1-White
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-04-21HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-02SenateFiled
2021-02-02SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1354 (Similar To) 2021-03-05 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB572
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00572I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00572S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00572E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00572H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00572F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00572H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00572H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00572I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00572I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00572E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00572H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00572H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00572F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00572F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB572&RcdVtNo=1278&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=113

Bill Comments 750

feedback