TX SB570 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to beginning teacher induction and mentoring programs for public schools.
Title
Relating to beginning teacher induction and mentoring programs for public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-05 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Education | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | Filed | |
2011-02-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers