TX SB568 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of child-care facilities and family homes; providing administrative penalties.
Title
Relating to the regulation of child-care facilities and family homes; providing administrative penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1933 (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1550 (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-25 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1933 (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1550 (Y: 135 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-25 | House | Record vote RV#1933 |
2019-05-25 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-24 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1550 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 1-Frank |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-04-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Schwertner |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4261 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Day Care
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INTERNET
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INTERNET
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control