TX SB563 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the definition of commercial property insurance for purposes of certain provisions governing insurance rates and policy forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the definition of commercial property insurance for purposes of certain provisions governing insurance rates and policy forms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-24HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2017-05-24HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-16HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-03HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-05-03HouseRead first time
2017-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenatePassed
2017-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-18SenateRecord vote
2017-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-12SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-10SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-01-20SenateFiled
2017-01-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback