TX SB554 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalty for theft of an official ballot or official carrier envelope for an election.
Title
Relating to the penalty for theft of an official ballot or official carrier envelope for an election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-13 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Elections
Elections--Administration
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Elections
Elections--Administration