TX SB550 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale or assignment of tax credits for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Title
Relating to the sale or assignment of tax credits for the certified rehabilitation of certified historic structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-04-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-24 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |