TX SB542 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the allocation of housing tax credits to developments within proximate geographical areas.
Title
Relating to the allocation of housing tax credits to developments within proximate geographical areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-24 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2186 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Referred to Urban Affairs
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions