TX SB539 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the qualifications for an impartial third party in certain civil disputes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the qualifications for an impartial third party in certain civil disputes.


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]


2017-05-27 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-27 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-19HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-03-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-22SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-22SenateRecord vote
2017-03-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-22SenateRecord vote
2017-03-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-22SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-03-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-03-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-08SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-01-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments