TX SB521 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the qualifications required of an appraisal district employee in order to testify as to the value of real property in certain ad valorem tax appeals.
Title
Relating to the qualifications required of an appraisal district employee in order to testify as to the value of real property in certain ad valorem tax appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts