TX SB52 | 2021 | 87th Legislature 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on October 19 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at public institutions of higher education, the oversight of certain capital projects at those institutions, and the designation of certain appropriated funds allocated to those institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of revenue bonds to fund capital projects at public institutions of higher education, the oversight of certain capital projects at those institutions, and the designation of certain appropriated funds allocated to those institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#141 (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-10-17 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#137 (Y: 34 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-10-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-15 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19 Sent to the Governor
2021-10-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-10-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-10-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-10-19SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-10-19HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-10-19SenateRecord vote
2021-10-19SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-10-19SenateRules suspended
2021-10-19SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 98
2021-10-19HouseRecord vote RV#150
2021-10-19HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-10-19HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 300
2021-10-18SenateConference committee report filed
2021-10-18HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-10-18SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-10-18SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-10-18HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-10-18HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-10-18HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-10-18HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-10-18HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-10-18SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-10-18SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-10-18SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-10-18SenateRead
2021-10-18SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-10-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-10-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-10-17HouseRecord vote RV#141
2021-10-17HousePassed
2021-10-17HouseRead 3rd time
2021-10-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-10-17HouseAmended 3-Burrows and Walle
2021-10-17HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-10-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-10-17HouseRecord vote RV#137
2021-10-17HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Schaefer
2021-10-17HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2021-10-17HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Schaefer
2021-10-17HouseAmended 1-Bonnen
2021-10-17HouseRead 2nd time
2021-10-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-10-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-10-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-10-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-10-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-10-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-10-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-10-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-10-16HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2021-10-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-10-15HouseReferred to Appropriations
2021-10-15HouseRead first time
2021-10-15SenateReported engrossed
2021-10-15SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-10-15SenateRecord vote
2021-10-15SenatePassed
2021-10-15SenateRead 3rd time
2021-10-15SenateRecord vote
2021-10-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-10-15SenateRecord vote
2021-10-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateAmendment adopted as substituted FA7 Bettencourt
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateAmendment substituted
2021-10-15SenateSubstitute amendment offered 8 Bettencourt
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA7 Bettencourt
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateAmended
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA6 Creighton
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateAmended
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Hinojosa
2021-10-15SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Gutierrez
2021-10-15SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Gutierrez
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateAmended
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Miles
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateAmended
2021-10-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
2021-10-15SenateRead 2nd time
2021-10-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-10-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-10-15SenateOrdered not printed
2021-10-15SenatePrinting rule suspended
2021-10-15SenateCo-author authorized
2021-10-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-10-14SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-10-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-10-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-10-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-10-12SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-10-12SenateRead first time
2021-10-12SenateFiled
2021-10-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=873&Bill=SB52
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00052I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00052S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00052E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00052H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/billtext/html/SB00052F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F3.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F4.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F5.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F6.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F7.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052S2F8.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/amendments/html/SB00052H23.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/analysis/html/SB00052I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/fiscalnotes/html/SB00052I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/fiscalnotes/html/SB00052S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/analysis/html/SB00052S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/fiscalnotes/html/SB00052E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/fiscalnotes/html/SB00052H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/analysis/html/SB00052H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/873/fiscalnotes/html/SB00052F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=873&Bill=SB52&RcdVtNo=137&Ch=H&Dt=10/17/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=873&Bill=SB52&RcdVtNo=141&Ch=H&Dt=10/17/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/873/pdf/87S310-15-F1.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/873/pdf/87S310-15-F1.PDF#page=7

Bill Comments

feedback