TX SB518 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to initiatives designed to improve performance of public school students, including initiatives specifically for students enrolled at the sixth, seventh, and eighth grade levels.
Title
Relating to initiatives designed to improve performance of public school students, including initiatives specifically for students enrolled at the sixth, seventh, and eighth grade levels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Amended | |
2011-04-26 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Education | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Filed | |
2011-02-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ACADEMIC PERFORMANCE
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR