TX SB507 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to mediation of the settlement of certain out-of-network health benefit claims involving balance billing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to mediation of the settlement of certain out-of-network health benefit claims involving balance billing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#739 (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#694 (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-11SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-11HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-11SenateRecord vote
2017-05-11SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-11SenateRead
2017-05-11SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-05SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-03HouseAmendment withdrawn
2017-05-03HousePoint of order overruled
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-13HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-04-13HouseRead first time
2017-03-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-28SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenatePassed
2017-03-28SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-28SenateRecord vote
2017-03-28SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-28SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-28SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-17SenateFiled
2017-01-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB507
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00507I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00507S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00507E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00507H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00507F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB507&RcdVtNo=694&Ch=H&Dt=05/03/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB507&RcdVtNo=739&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ03-28-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-11-F.PDF#page=47

Bill Comments

feedback