TX SB507 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-19 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to filing a wage claim.
Title
Relating to filing a wage claim.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-19 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-21 | Filed | |
2009-01-21 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB762 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/09