TX SB505 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to imposing an additional fee for the registration of an electric vehicle.
Title
Relating to imposing an additional fee for the registration of an electric vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#589 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#575 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#574 (Y: 37 N: 104 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#573 (Y: 28 N: 113 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#575 (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#574 (Y: 37 N: 104 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#573 (Y: 28 N: 113 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-13 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-01 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#589 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#575 |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#574 |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 2-Flores |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#573 |
2023-04-26 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Zwiener |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 2199 |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2023-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-30 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2199 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2199 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB2199 (Same As) 2023-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Subjects
ELECTRIC VEHICLES
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Energy
Energy--Alternative Fuels
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
STATE HIGHWAY FUND
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration