TX SB505 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-23 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-23 - Received from the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibited discharge of a patient to certain unlicensed or unpermitted group-centered facilities.
Title
Relating to the prohibited discharge of a patient to certain unlicensed or unpermitted group-centered facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |