TX SB505 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to restrictions on lobbyist expenditures from certain political contributions.
Title
Relating to restrictions on lobbyist expenditures from certain political contributions.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Larry Taylor [R] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
Legislature
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
State Officers
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
Legislature
LOBBYISTS & LOBBYING
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
State Officers