TX SB500 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creating the criminal offense of operating a boarding home facility without a permit and to a study regarding the regulation of group homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creating the criminal offense of operating a boarding home facility without a permit and to a study regarding the regulation of group homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Amended RV#1541 (Y: 92 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1541
2021-05-26HousePassed as amended
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-Reynolds
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-03HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-05-03HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-29SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-28SenateFiled
2021-01-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1785 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - Referred to Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB500
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00500I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00500S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00500E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00500H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00500F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00500H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00500I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00500I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00500E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00500H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00500F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00500F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB500&RcdVtNo=1541&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=8

Bill Comments 750

feedback