TX SB500 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 79-20)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to the effect of certain felony convictions of public elected officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to the effect of certain felony convictions of public elected officers.


Sen. Nicholas Taylor [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]
Sen. Larry Taylor [R]Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]Rep. Charlie Geren [R]
Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Sarah Davis [R]Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Donna Howard [D]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]Rep. Eric Johnson [D]
Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Rodney Anderson [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]Rep. Ernest Bailes [R]
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]
Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Angie Button [R]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]
Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. Byron Cook [R]Rep. Byron Cook [R]
Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]Rep. Wayne Faircloth [R]
Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Pat Fallon [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]Rep. Craig Goldman [R]
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]
Rep. Roland Gutierrez [D]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Jason Isaac [R]
Rep. Jason Isaac [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]Rep. Mark Keough [R]
Rep. Mark Keough [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Rick Miller [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]
Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]Rep. Joe Pickett [D]
Rep. Joe Pickett [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]
Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Kevin Roberts [R]Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]
Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]Rep. Ron Simmons [R]
Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]
Rep. Ed Thompson [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. Jason Villalba [R]
Rep. Jason Villalba [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. John Wray [R]

Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - Amended RV#1253 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]


2017-06-06 Effective immediately
2017-06-06 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-22SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-16SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-15HouseRecord vote
2017-05-15HousePassed as amended
2017-05-15HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-07HouseReferred to General Investigating & Ethics
2017-03-07HouseRead first time
2017-02-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-09HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-02-08SenateReported engrossed
2017-02-08SenateRecord vote
2017-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2017-02-08SenateRecord vote
2017-02-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-02-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-02-08SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-02-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-02-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-02-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-02-08SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-02-08SenateRead 2nd time
2017-02-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-02-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-07SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-02SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-02-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-30SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-01-30SenateRead first time
2017-01-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments