TX SB5 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the expansion of broadband services to certain areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the expansion of broadband services to certain areas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-07HouseRead first time
2021-04-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-31SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-31SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenatePassed
2021-03-31SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-31SenateRecord vote
2021-03-31SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-31SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31SenateAmended
2021-03-31SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
2021-03-31SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-31SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-30SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2021-02-26SenateFiled
2021-02-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback