TX SB498 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the trapping and transport of surplus white-tailed deer.
Title
Relating to the trapping and transport of surplus white-tailed deer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Read | |
2011-05-27 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | House passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-05-24 | Postponed | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-17 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-11 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2011-04-11 | Read first time | |
2011-04-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | Filed | |
2011-02-01 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Animals
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
PERMITS
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
Property Interests--Real Property
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
PERMITS
Property Interests
Property Interests--General
Property Interests--Real Property