TX SB495 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of a task force to study maternal mortality and severe maternal morbidity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of a task force to study maternal mortality and severe maternal morbidity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-17 - House - SB 495Third Reading House (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2013-05-21SenateRecord vote
2013-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2013-05-21SenateRead
2013-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-17SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17HouseRecord vote
2013-05-17HousePassed
2013-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2013-05-16HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-16HouseAmended
2013-05-16HouseAmended
2013-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-05-03HouseReferred to Public Health
2013-05-03HouseRead first time
2013-05-02HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2013-05-02SenateRecord vote
2013-05-02SenatePassed
2013-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-02SenateRecord vote
2013-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-05-02SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-02SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-26SenateCo-author authorized
2013-02-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-02-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-02-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2013-02-13SenateRead first time
2013-02-11SenateFiled
2013-02-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback