TX SB494 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability of certain property and casualty insurance forms on the Internet.
Title
Relating to the availability of certain property and casualty insurance forms on the Internet.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - SB 494Third Reading House (Y: 90 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed |
2015-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-14 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-04-30 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-31 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Insurance
Insurance--Property & Casualty
INTERNET
PUBLIC INSURANCE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF
Insurance
Insurance--Property & Casualty
INTERNET
PUBLIC INSURANCE COUNSEL, OFFICE OF