TX SB493 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to qualifications for certain individuals for veterans benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to qualifications for certain individuals for veterans benefits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-03-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-03-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-03-21SenateVote taken in committee
2023-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-02-17SenateReferred to Vet Affairs
2023-02-17SenateRead first time
2023-01-18SenateFiled
2023-01-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4174 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
HB4174 (Same As) 2023-03-21 - Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback