TX SB49 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the appointment by certain elected officials of students to receive a Texas Armed Services Scholarship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the appointment by certain elected officials of students to receive a Texas Armed Services Scholarship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1814 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-03-07HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-03-06SenateReported engrossed
2017-03-06SenateRecord vote
2017-03-06SenatePassed
2017-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-06SenateRecord vote
2017-03-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-03-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-03-06SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-03-06SenateRecord vote
2017-03-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-06SenateRules suspended-Constitutional 60-Day
2017-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-28SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-02-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-02-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-01-24SenateRead first time
2016-11-14SenateFiled
2016-11-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback