TX SB488 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for certain petitions requesting an election and ballot propositions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Elections
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-05SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed
2017-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateAmended
2017-04-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateAmended
2017-04-05SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-05SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-05SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-25SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-23SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-13SenateFiled
2017-01-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback