TX SB488 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to criminal background checks on users of online dating services and to disclosures of online dating safety measures; providing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to criminal background checks on users of online dating services and to disclosures of online dating safety measures; providing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-28 | Signed in the House | |
2011-04-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-04-27 | House passage reported | |
2011-04-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Laid out in lieu of companion | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-04 | Referred to Technology | |
2011-04-04 | Read first time | |
2011-03-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-03-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-03-07 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-02-22 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-02-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | Filed | |
2011-02-01 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Electronic Information Systems
Business & Commerce--General
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Electronic Information Systems